Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 02/28/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/28/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/04/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/07/2001
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/21/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 06/29/2001
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 09/05/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/21/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 11/16/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 12/19/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/26/2002