Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 02/15/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/01/2001
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/06/2001
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/12/2001
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/12/2001
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 03/26/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/03/2001