Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/27/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/27/2001
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 02/27/2001
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/20/2001
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/23/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/18/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/19/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/19/2001
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 06/21/2001
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/25/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/09/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/09/2001
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 07/11/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/19/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 07/26/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 09/04/2001