There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Madrid Protocol Implementation Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Madrid Protocol Implementation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Trademark Act of 1946 to provide for the registration and protection of trademarks used in commerce, in order to carry out provisions of certain international conventions, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
07/25/2001Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 107-46.
02/27/2001Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date All Actions
06/14/2002Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5583)
Action By: Senate
06/07/2002Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5252-5254)
Action By: Senate
07/25/2001Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 101.
Action By: Senate
07/25/2001Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 107-46.
07/19/2001Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
06/14/2001Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5583)
Action By: Senate
02/27/2001Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1635-1637)
Action By: Senate
02/27/2001Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1634-1635)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/27/2001

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary02/27/2001 Referred to
07/19/2001 Markup by
07/25/2001 Reported by S. Rept. 107-46

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.407. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (07/25/2001)

Madrid Protocol Implementation Act - Amends the Trademark Act of 1946 to set forth the Madrid Protocol concerning the International Registration of Marks.

Authorizes the owner of a basic application for mark registration pending before, or of a basic registration granted by, the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office who is a U.S. national, is domiciled in the United States, or has a real and effective industrial or commercial establishment in the United States to file an international application with the Office. Requires the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks to certify that information contained in the international application corresponds to that in the basic application or registration and to transmit the application to the International Bureau of the World Intellectual Property Organization.

Authorizes holders of international registrations based on U.S. registrations to request extensions of protection from the International Bureau or the Office and entitles them to: (1) extensions of U.S. protection; and (2) a right of priority under the Paris Convention for the Protection of Industrial Property, subject to certain conditions.

Bars protection: (1) for an international registration if the Office is the office of origin; and (2) to any mark not registrable on the Principal Register.

Sets forth provisions relating to extension of U.S. protection (including cancellation of such protection) for goods and services under an international registration that has been canceled or is not renewed, and concerning authorized holders of such registrations.

Authorizes extensions of protection only to persons who are nationals of, or have other specified connections to, a country that is a Contracting Party or a member of an intergovernmental organization that is a Contracting Party to the Protocol.