Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/28/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/08/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/14/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/14/2001
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 03/20/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/22/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/27/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/27/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/03/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 05/02/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/03/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 05/21/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/05/2001
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/27/2001
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/20/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/24/2001