Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 01/31/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 01/31/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 01/31/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 01/31/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 01/31/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 01/31/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 01/31/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 01/31/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/06/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 02/06/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 02/06/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/06/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/06/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/06/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/06/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/06/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/07/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/07/2001
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 02/15/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 02/15/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 02/15/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/15/2001
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 02/28/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/28/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 03/07/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 03/08/2001
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/12/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 03/12/2001
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/14/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 03/21/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 03/26/2001
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 03/26/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/24/2001
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/25/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 05/08/2001
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/14/2001
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/17/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/24/2001
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/05/2001