Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/28/2001
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/05/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/19/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 03/19/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/20/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/23/2001
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/26/2001
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/26/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/27/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/29/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/04/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/24/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/26/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/26/2001
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 04/26/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/23/2001