Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 03/01/2001
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 03/01/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/01/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/01/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 03/01/2001
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/01/2001
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 03/01/2001
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/15/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/15/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/21/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 04/23/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/25/2001