Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 05/09/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/09/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/09/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/09/2001
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 06/19/2001
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 07/16/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/09/2002
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/16/2002
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/16/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/27/2002
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 07/24/2002