Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 03/07/2001
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 03/07/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/07/2001
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 03/07/2001
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 03/07/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/07/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 03/07/2001
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN]* 03/07/2001
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 03/07/2001
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 03/07/2001
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/07/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 03/22/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 03/27/2001
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 04/03/2001
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/30/2001
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/23/2001
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/25/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/16/2001