Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 03/07/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 03/07/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/07/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/07/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 03/07/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 03/07/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/12/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/19/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/14/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/07/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/12/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 10/11/2001