There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

A bill to authorize the Secretary of the Interior, pursuant to the provisions of the Reclamation Wastewater and Groundwater Study and Facilties Act to participate in the design, planning, and construction of the Denver Water Reuse project.

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Reclamation Wastewater and Groundwater Study and Facilities Act to authorize the Secretary of the Interior to participate in the design, planning, and construction of the Denver Water Reuse project.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
09/23/2002Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 107-666.
08/03/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8996; text: CR S8996)
06/05/2001Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 107-25.
03/08/2001Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/23/2002HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 409.
09/23/2002HouseReported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 107-666.
09/12/2002HouseSubcommittee on Water and Power Discharged.
09/12/2002HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Resources
09/12/2002HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Resources
09/06/2001HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
09/06/2001HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Action By: Committee on Resources
09/05/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
09/05/2001-2:06pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/05/2001SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/04/2001SenateThe title amendment was further modified by Unanimous Consent.
09/04/2001SenateMeasure amended in Senate by unanimous consent after passage by Unanimous Consent.
08/03/2001SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8996; text: CR S8996)
06/05/2001SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 60.
06/05/2001SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 107-25.
05/16/2001SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
03/08/2001SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2076)
03/08/2001SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2075-2076)

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/08/2001 Referred to
05/16/2001 Markup by
06/05/2001 Reported by S. Rept. 107-25
House Resources09/05/2001 Referred to
09/12/2002 Markup by
09/23/2002 Reported by H. Rept. 107-666
House Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power09/06/2001 Referred to
09/12/2002 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.491.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.491. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (08/03/2001)

Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior, in cooperation with State and local authorities, to participate in the design, planning, and construction of the Denver Water Reuse project to reclaim and reuse water in the service area of the Denver Water Department of Denver, Colorado.

Limits the Federal share of the Project's cost to 25 percent of the total cost.

Prohibits the use of funds provided by the Secretary for the operation or maintenance of the project.

Provides that the design, planning, and construction of the Project shall be in accordance with, and subject to the limitations contained in, the Reclamation Wastewater and Groundwater Study and Facilities Act.