Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 03/09/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/05/2001
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/05/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/02/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/03/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/07/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/07/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/09/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/09/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 08/01/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 08/02/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 09/04/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/07/2002