Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 03/13/2001
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 03/13/2001
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 03/14/2001
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/19/2001
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/26/2001
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/09/2001
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/09/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/09/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 10/03/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/23/2002