Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 03/15/2001
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 03/15/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/15/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 03/15/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/15/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/15/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 03/15/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/15/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/15/2001
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/15/2001
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/15/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/15/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 03/15/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/19/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/20/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 03/20/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/21/2001
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/22/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/02/2001
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 04/02/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/02/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 04/03/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/05/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/25/2001
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 04/26/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/30/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 05/02/2001
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/08/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/22/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 06/05/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/05/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 06/11/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/13/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/14/2001
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/18/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/19/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/26/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/09/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 07/10/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/10/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/12/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/12/2001
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/16/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/16/2001
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/17/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 07/23/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/24/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/25/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/26/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 07/27/2001
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/27/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 08/01/2001
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 08/03/2001
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 08/03/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/04/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/04/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/04/2001
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/06/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/19/2001
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 09/24/2001
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 09/26/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/01/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/01/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 10/03/2001
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 11/05/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 06/25/2002