Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/15/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/15/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/15/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/15/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/15/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/21/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/21/2001
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/19/2001
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 06/20/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/26/2001
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/10/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/16/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/10/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 12/20/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 04/10/2002
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/07/2002
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/04/2002