Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 03/19/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/19/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 03/19/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/19/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/19/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 03/27/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/17/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/17/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/17/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/17/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/17/2001
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/17/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/17/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 05/17/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/17/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 05/17/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/17/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/17/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/17/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/17/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 05/17/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 05/17/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/17/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/17/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/17/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/17/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 05/17/2001
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/17/2001
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/17/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/17/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/17/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/17/2001
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/17/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/17/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/17/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/17/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/17/2001
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/17/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/17/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/17/2001
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 05/17/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/17/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/22/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 05/22/2001
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/22/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 05/22/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/22/2001
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 05/22/2001
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/22/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 07/19/2001