Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/20/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 03/20/2001
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/03/2001
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/09/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/09/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/06/2001
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/22/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/12/2001
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 07/27/2001