Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 03/21/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/21/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 03/21/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 03/21/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 03/21/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 03/21/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 05/23/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/23/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/14/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/19/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/20/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/09/2001
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/10/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 07/12/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/18/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/27/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/15/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/30/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/14/2002