Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 03/26/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/26/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 03/26/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/26/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 03/26/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/26/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/26/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/26/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/26/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 03/26/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 03/27/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/28/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/04/2001
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/04/2001
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 05/01/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/01/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/01/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 05/07/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/05/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/13/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/19/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/29/2001
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/17/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/17/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/17/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/04/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 11/29/2001
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 02/25/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 04/08/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/19/2002
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 06/24/2002
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/24/2002
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 06/26/2002
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/16/2002
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 07/22/2002
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 09/09/2002