There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

United States-Jordan Free Trade Area Implementation Act

Short Titles as Introduced

United States-Jordan Free Trade Area Implementation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to implement the agreement establishing a United States-Jordan free trade area.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/04/2001Committee on Finance. Reported by Senator Baucus with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 107-59.
03/28/2001Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date
09/24/2001Indefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Senate
09/06/2001Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S9151)
Action By: Senate
09/04/2001Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 148.
Action By: Senate
09/04/2001Committee on Finance. Reported by Senator Baucus with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 107-59.
Action By: Committee on Finance
07/26/2001Committee on Finance. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Finance
03/28/2001Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3060-3063)
Action By: Senate
03/28/2001Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3059-3060)
Action By: Senate

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance03/28/2001 Referred to
07/26/2001 Markup by
09/04/2001 Reported by S. Rept. 107-59

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.643. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (09/04/2001)

United States-Jordan Free Trade Area Implementation Act - Approves the Agreement between the United States of America and the Hashemite Kingdom of Jordan on the Establishment of a Free Trade Area (Agreement), entered into on October 24, 2000, and submitted to Congress on January 6, 2001.

Title I: Tariff Modifications; Rules of Origin - Authorizes the President to proclaim such modifications or continuation of duty, continuation of duty-free or excise treatment, or additional duties as are deemed necessary or appropriate to carry out the Agreement between the United States of America and the Hashemite Kingdom of Jordan on the Establishment of a Free Trade Area (Agreement), entered into on October 24, 2000. Sets forth certain rules of origin with respect to the reduction or elimination of any duty imposed by the United States on Jordanian textile, fabric, or apparel articles as provided in such Agreement.

Title II: Relief From Imports - Subtitle A: General Provisions - Defines specified terms.

Subtitle B: Relief From Imports Benefitting From the Agreement - Directs the International Trade Commission (ITC), upon the filing of a petition by an entity (including a trade association, firm, certified or recognized union, or group of workers representative of an industry) requesting trade relief from U.S. obligations under the Agreement (or alleging that critical circumstances exist), to initiate an investigation to determine whether, as a result of the reduction or elimination of a duty provided for under the Agreement, a Jordanian article is being imported into the United States in such increased quantities and under such conditions that such imports alone constitute a substantial cause of serious injury or threat thereof to the domestic industry producing an article that is like, or directly competitive with, the imported article. Prescribes a procedure for ITC action on such a petition. Requires the President, upon an affirmative determination by the ITC, to provide necessary import relief (including suspension of any further duty reduction, or an increase in the rate duty, on imported Jordanian articles under the Agreement) and facilitate domestic industry efforts to make a positive adjustment to import competition, unless the provision of such relief is not in the U.S. national economic interest, or in extraordinary circumstances, the provision of relief would cause serious harm to U.S. national security.

Subtitle C: Cases Under Title II of the Trade Act of 1974 - Requires the ITC, if an affirmative determination about import competition has been made under the Trade Act of 1974, also to find whether imports of Jordanian articles are a substantial cause of serious injury or threat. Requires the President to review such a determination, and authorizes exclusion of such Jordanian imports from remedial action if the final determination is negative.

Title III: Temporary Entry - Authorizes a Jordanian national (including any spouse or child, if accompanying or following to join such national) to enter the United States pursuant to the Agreement as a nonimmigrant if such entrance is solely to carry on substantial trade, or solely to develop the operations of an enterprise in which he has invested a substantial amount of capital.

Title IV: General Provisions - Declares that U.S. law shall supercede any inconsistent Agreement provisions.

(Sec. 402) Authorizes appropriations for each fiscal year after FY 2001 to the Department of Commerce for the payment of the U.S. share of expenses incurred in dispute settlement proceedings under the Agreement.