Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/07/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 06/11/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/20/2001
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/25/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/12/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/16/2002
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/16/2002
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 05/16/2002