There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Housing Bond and Credit Modernization and Fairness Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to repeal the required use of certain principal repayments on mortgage subsidy bond financing to redeem bonds, to modify the purchase price limitation under mortgage subsidy bond rules based on median family income, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/02/2001Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
04/02/2001Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3281)
Action By: Senate
04/02/2001Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3280-3281)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (78)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 04/02/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 04/02/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 04/02/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 04/02/2001
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 04/02/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/03/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 04/03/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/24/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/08/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/14/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 05/14/2001
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/15/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/23/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/24/2001
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/24/2001
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 05/24/2001
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 06/05/2001
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 06/05/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 06/06/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/13/2001
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/14/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 06/18/2001
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/20/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 06/21/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/27/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 06/27/2001
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 06/27/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 06/28/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/18/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 07/25/2001
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 07/31/2001
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 08/02/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 09/06/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/06/2001
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 09/06/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 09/10/2001
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 09/21/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/25/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 09/25/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/01/2001
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 10/10/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/10/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/10/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 10/15/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 10/16/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/27/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 11/28/2001
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 12/20/2001
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/06/2002
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 02/06/2002
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 02/08/2002
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/21/2002
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/21/2002
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/18/2002
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 04/18/2002
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 04/25/2002
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/25/2002
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/15/2002
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/22/2002
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 06/04/2002
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/05/2002
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/05/2002
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/05/2002
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/07/2002
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/18/2002
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/18/2002
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 06/18/2002
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/21/2002
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/25/2002
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/25/2002
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 06/27/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/15/2002
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/09/2002
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/19/2002
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/19/2002
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 11/13/2002
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 11/13/2002
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 11/13/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance04/02/2001 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (16)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.677. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/02/2001)

Housing Bond and Credit Modernization and Fairness Act of 2001 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) repeal the required use of certain principal repayments on mortgage subsidy bond financings to redeem bonds; (2) modify the purchase price limitation under mortgage subsidy bond rules based on median family income; and (3) define the term "area median gross income" for low-income housing credit projects.