Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 04/03/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/03/2001
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/01/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 05/09/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 11/28/2001
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 02/05/2002
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 02/14/2002
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 02/25/2002
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 02/25/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 02/28/2002
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 04/09/2002