Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 04/05/2001
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 04/05/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 04/05/2001
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 04/05/2001
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 04/05/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 04/05/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/05/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 04/05/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 04/05/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/05/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 04/05/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/05/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 05/01/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/01/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/15/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/21/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/17/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 07/18/2001