Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 04/06/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 04/06/2001
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 04/06/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 04/06/2001
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 04/06/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 04/06/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 04/06/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 04/06/2001
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 04/06/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 04/06/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 04/06/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 04/06/2001
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 04/06/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/06/2001
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 04/06/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/06/2001
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 04/06/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 04/06/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 04/06/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 04/06/2001
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 04/23/2001
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/01/2001
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 05/01/2001
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/01/2001
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 05/01/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/02/2001
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/02/2001
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/02/2001
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 05/02/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/07/2001
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 05/07/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/07/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 05/07/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/07/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/09/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/09/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/09/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 05/09/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/10/2001
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/10/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 05/10/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/10/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/10/2001
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/10/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/10/2001
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/16/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/16/2001
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 05/16/2001
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/16/2001
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 05/16/2001
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/17/2001
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/24/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 06/05/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/12/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/11/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 01/23/2002