Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 04/26/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/26/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/26/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/26/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 04/26/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 04/26/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 04/26/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/26/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/26/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 04/26/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 04/26/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 04/26/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/22/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/05/2001
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 06/05/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/22/2002
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 07/18/2002