Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/01/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/01/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/01/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 05/01/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/10/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 05/14/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/21/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 06/06/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/21/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/26/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 07/09/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/09/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/23/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 12/03/2001