Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 05/03/2001
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 05/03/2001
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 05/03/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 05/03/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/03/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 05/03/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 05/03/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 05/03/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/10/2001
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/10/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/10/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/10/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 05/10/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 05/15/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 05/17/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/17/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/17/2001
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 05/21/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 05/21/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/05/2001
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 06/05/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/05/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/10/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/10/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 07/16/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 07/16/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 07/16/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/19/2001
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/04/2001
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/04/2001
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 09/05/2001
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 09/05/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/09/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/09/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/27/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 01/29/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/13/2002