Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/03/2001
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 05/03/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/03/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 05/03/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 05/03/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/03/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/03/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/03/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 05/03/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 05/03/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/03/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/04/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/08/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/09/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 05/17/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/17/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/24/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/24/2001
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/06/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/18/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 06/27/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/17/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/17/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/26/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 09/10/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/24/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 02/12/2002
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 04/10/2002
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/17/2002
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 04/25/2002
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/01/2002
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/07/2002
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/07/2002
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/09/2002
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/14/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/04/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/18/2002
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/10/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 07/10/2002
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/31/2002
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 07/31/2002
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 09/12/2002
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 10/07/2002
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 11/12/2002