Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 05/10/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 05/10/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/10/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/10/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/10/2001
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 05/10/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/17/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/22/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/07/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/12/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/09/2002