Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/10/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/10/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 05/10/2001
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/21/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/11/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 06/13/2001
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/18/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/19/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/21/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/26/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/16/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/18/2001
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 08/01/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/08/2002
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/21/2002
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/23/2002