Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 01/22/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/22/2001
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 01/24/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 01/24/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 01/29/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/29/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 01/30/2001
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 01/30/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 01/31/2001
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 01/31/2001
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 02/01/2001
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 02/07/2001
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 02/07/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/07/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/08/2001
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 02/08/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/08/2001
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/27/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 02/27/2001
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/01/2001
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/06/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/24/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 04/24/2001
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/14/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/16/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/14/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 06/14/2001
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 06/18/2001
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 06/27/2001
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/25/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/25/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/04/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/12/2001
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 11/01/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 11/27/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 05/08/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew