Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 05/22/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/22/2001
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 05/22/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/22/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/13/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 06/13/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/13/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/27/2001
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/27/2001
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/27/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 06/27/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 06/27/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 06/27/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 08/03/2001
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 12/03/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 12/03/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 12/03/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 12/03/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 12/03/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 12/07/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 12/07/2001