Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/23/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 05/23/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 06/19/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/25/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/28/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/17/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/27/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 08/01/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 12/11/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 03/12/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/22/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 06/03/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/25/2002