Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/24/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 06/07/2001
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 09/10/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/13/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/14/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 11/29/2001
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/21/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 05/20/2002
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/17/2002