Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/25/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/25/2001
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/25/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 05/25/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 05/25/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 05/25/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 05/25/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/25/2001
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 05/25/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/25/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 05/25/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/25/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 05/25/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/25/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/25/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/25/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/25/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/25/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 05/25/2001
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 05/25/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 05/25/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/25/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 05/25/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/25/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/05/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 06/05/2001
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 06/05/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/05/2001
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/05/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 06/05/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 06/05/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/05/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/05/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 06/05/2001
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/06/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/25/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 04/17/2002