There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 39 Tremont Street, Paris Hill, Maine, as the Horatio King Post Office Building.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
02/14/2002Became Public Law No: 107-145. (TXT | PDF)
02/14/2002Signed by President.
02/12/2002Presented to President.
02/05/2002Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 394 - 0 (Roll no. 7).(text: CR H119)
08/03/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9000; text: CR S9000)
08/02/2001Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
05/25/2001Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
02/14/2002Became Public Law No: 107-145. (TXT | PDF)
02/14/2002Signed by President.
02/12/2002SenatePresented to President.
02/05/2002-7:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/05/2002-7:00pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 394 - 0 (Roll no. 7). (text: CR H119)
02/05/2002-6:51pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H122-123)
02/05/2002-2:55pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
02/05/2002-2:49pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 970.
02/05/2002-2:49pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H119-120)
02/05/2002-2:48pmHouseMr. Horn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/05/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
09/05/2001-2:06pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/05/2001SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/03/2001SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9000; text: CR S9000)
08/02/2001SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 126.
08/02/2001SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
08/02/2001SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/10/2001SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on International Security, Proliferation and Federal Services.
Action By: Committee on Governmental Affairs
05/25/2001SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
05/25/2001SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5701)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/25/2001

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Governmental Affairs05/25/2001 Referred to
08/02/2001 Markup by
08/02/2001 Reported by
Senate Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on International Security, Proliferation and Federal Services07/10/2001 Referred to
House Government Reform09/05/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.970.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.970. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (08/02/2001)

Designates the U.S. Postal Service facility located at 39 Tremont Street, Paris Hill, Maine, as the Horatio King Post Office Building.