Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 09/04/2001
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 09/05/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/05/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 09/19/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 09/20/2001
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/25/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 10/30/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/30/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 11/05/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 11/06/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 11/07/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/09/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 11/13/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 11/13/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 11/15/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 12/04/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 12/06/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 12/14/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 12/18/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 12/19/2001