Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 06/07/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/08/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/12/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/13/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/14/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 06/25/2001
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 06/29/2001
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 06/29/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/10/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/11/2001
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/18/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/19/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 07/23/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/23/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/25/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/25/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 07/26/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 07/27/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 08/01/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/04/2001
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/04/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 12/04/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 02/06/2002
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 02/08/2002
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 02/12/2002
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 03/01/2002
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/01/2002
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/05/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 03/06/2002
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/20/2002
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 04/09/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/09/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 04/17/2002
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 04/23/2002
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/23/2002
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/29/2002
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/29/2002
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/29/2002
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/30/2002
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/01/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/07/2002
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/07/2002
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 05/07/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/07/2002
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 05/08/2002
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/09/2002
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/10/2002
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/14/2002
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 05/17/2002
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 05/23/2002
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/06/2002
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 06/10/2002
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 06/11/2002
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/18/2002
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 06/18/2002
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/21/2002
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/25/2002
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/27/2002
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 06/28/2002
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/08/2002
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/11/2002
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 07/22/2002
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/22/2002