Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 02/14/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/14/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/14/2001
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/15/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/15/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/26/2001
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/26/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/26/2001
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/26/2001
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 02/26/2001
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/01/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/01/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/08/2001
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/08/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/08/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 03/08/2001
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/08/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/08/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/22/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/22/2001
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/22/2001
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/22/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 03/29/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/24/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/24/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 04/24/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/01/2001
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/11/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 06/11/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 07/10/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 02/06/2002
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/28/2002
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 05/16/2002
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/16/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/16/2002
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/19/2002
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/19/2002
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 07/15/2002
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/17/2002
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/09/2002
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 09/09/2002
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/13/2002
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 09/13/2002
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/18/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 09/24/2002
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/25/2002
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/26/2002
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 10/01/2002
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/10/2002