There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution honoring the heroism and courage displayed by airline flight attendants on a daily basis.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
09/24/2002Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6487)
06/19/2002Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S5789)
06/19/2002Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5789)
05/13/2002Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
09/24/2002-3:22pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/24/2002-3:22pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6487)
09/24/2002-3:02pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. Con. Res. 110.
09/24/2002-3:02pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6487-6488)
09/24/2002-3:02pmHouseMr. Mica moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
06/20/2002HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
06/20/2002-10:26amHouseReceived in the House.
06/20/2002SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/19/2002SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5789)
06/19/2002SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5789)
05/13/2002SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4285-4286)
05/13/2002SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S4286-4287)

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 05/13/2002
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/16/2002
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/22/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 06/03/2002
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/10/2002
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 06/10/2002
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/13/2002
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 06/13/2002
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/13/2002
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/18/2002
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/18/2002

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation05/13/2002 Referred to
06/19/2002 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/20/2002 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Con.Res.110. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (06/19/2002)

Expresses profound gratitude for the faithful service provided by flight attendants to make air travel safe and honors their courage and dedication.

Supports all flight attendants who continue to display heroism on a daily basis, as they had been doing before, during, and after September 11, 2001.