Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 05/13/2002
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/13/2002
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/16/2002
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/22/2002
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 06/03/2002
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/10/2002
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 06/10/2002
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/13/2002
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 06/13/2002
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/13/2002
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/18/2002
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/18/2002