Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 08/01/2002
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/03/2002
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/03/2002
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 09/10/2002
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/12/2002
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/13/2002
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/13/2002
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/12/2002
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/12/2002
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 11/12/2002
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 11/12/2002
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 11/12/2002
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 11/12/2002
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 11/13/2002