Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 01/24/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 01/24/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/24/2001
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 01/24/2001
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 01/24/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 01/24/2001
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/24/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 01/24/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/24/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/24/2001
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/24/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 01/24/2001
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 01/24/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/24/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 01/24/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 01/24/2001
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 01/31/2001
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 01/31/2001
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 01/31/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 02/14/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 04/03/2001
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/16/2001
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/21/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 05/21/2001
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/05/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 06/07/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/11/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 06/18/2001
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/21/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/21/2001
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 06/22/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/09/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/09/2001
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/12/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/16/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 07/25/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 07/27/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/31/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 12/12/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 12/13/2001
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 12/20/2001
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 06/12/2002
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/12/2002
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 10/08/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/09/2002
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 10/10/2002
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 10/10/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/16/2002
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 11/19/2002
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 11/19/2002