Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 04/26/2001
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 04/26/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/24/2001
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/06/2001
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/27/2001
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/10/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/10/2001