Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 05/24/2001
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/05/2001
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/05/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/06/2001
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 06/07/2001
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/08/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/11/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/12/2001
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/18/2001
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 06/25/2001
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/25/2001