Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/05/2001
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/05/2001
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/13/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 06/19/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 06/28/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/29/2001
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/09/2001
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 07/10/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/16/2001