Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 09/19/2001
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/20/2001
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/20/2001
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 09/20/2001
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 09/20/2001
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/20/2001
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/20/2001
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 09/20/2001
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/20/2001
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/20/2001
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 09/20/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/20/2001
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 09/20/2001
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/20/2001
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/20/2001
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/20/2001
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 09/20/2001
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 09/20/2001
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/20/2001
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/20/2001
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 09/20/2001
Sen. Carnahan, Jean [D-MO] 09/20/2001
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/20/2001
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 09/20/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 09/20/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 09/20/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/20/2001
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/20/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 09/20/2001
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/20/2001
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 09/20/2001
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 09/20/2001
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 09/20/2001
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/21/2001
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 09/21/2001
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 09/21/2001
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/21/2001
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/21/2001
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 09/25/2001
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 09/25/2001
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/26/2001
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/26/2001
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 10/09/2001
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/09/2001
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 10/17/2001
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/13/2001
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 11/29/2001