Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/01/2001
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/01/2001
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/01/2001
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 02/01/2001
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 02/01/2001
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 02/06/2001
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/13/2001
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/14/2001
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 02/26/2001
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/26/2001
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/13/2001